Global Patent Index - EP 1239090 A2

EP 1239090 A2 2002-09-11 - Container manhole

Title (en)

Container manhole

Title (de)

Schachtbehälter

Title (fr)

Regard conteneur

Publication

EP 1239090 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005188 A

Priority

DE 10111617 A

Abstract (en)

The shaft container (10), for supply shafts, has an outer concrete container (12) in a beaker shape with an inner container liner (14) of fluid-impermeable plastics in a beaker shape. A space gap (20) is formed between the concrete side wall (16) of the outer container and the lining, to give movement of the lining within the outer container structure in a limited floating range, to prevent damaging tensions and cracks through expansion and contraction on changes of temperature.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schachtbehälter (10) für Versorgungsschächte weist einen becherförmigen Außenbehälter (12) aus Beton und einen in den Außenbehälter (12) eingesetzten flüssigkeitsdichten becherförmigen Kunststoff-Innenbehälter (14) auf. Zwischen der Seitenwand (16) des Außenbehälters (12) und der Seitenwand (18) des Innenbehälters (14) ist ein spaltartiger Zwischenraum (20) gebildet, so dass der Innenbehälter (14) beweglich in dem Außenbehälter (12) lagert. Der Innenbehälter lagert in engen Grenzen beweglich, d.h. "schwimmend", in dem Außenbehälter. Auf diese Weise können die durch das unterschiedliche Wärmeausdehnungsverhalten des Innen- und Außenbehälters bedingten Bewegungen nicht zu Spannungen und Rissen führen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 5/02; B65D 90/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/12 (2006.01); E03F 5/02 (2006.01); E06C 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/025 (2013.01); E02D 29/12 (2013.01); E02D 29/125 (2013.01); E03F 5/02 (2013.01); E03F 5/021 (2013.01); E06C 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239090 A2 20020911; EP 1239090 A3 20040128; DE 10111617 A1 20020912; PL 199674 B1 20081031; PL 352697 A1 20020923

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-10-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20040721

- Countries: SI

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI