Global Patent Index - EP 1239091 A3

EP 1239091 A3 2002-11-20 - Non-return closure for sewer system ducts

Title (en)

Non-return closure for sewer system ducts

Title (de)

Rücklaufsperrvorrichtung für die Kanäle eines Abwassersystems

Title (fr)

Dispositif anti-retour pour des conduits d'un système d'égout

Publication

EP 1239091 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02380051 A

Priority

ES 200100504 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1239091A2] Non-return closure for sewer system ducts, that comprises a tubular body (1) of cylindrical general section, finished at one of its ends in a length of square seccion (2) that terminates in an oblique open base (3), on which is monted a cover (4) that is hinged to the innermost non oblique edge (6), in accordance with an axis parallel to said edge, the cover of which covers the whole open base and is provided with lateral skirts (7) that abut on the outside, in the closed position, against the adjacent walls. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239091 A2 20020911; EP 1239091 A3 20021120; ES 1048507 U 20010901; ES 1048507 Y 20011216

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-09-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI