Global Patent Index - EP 1239092 A1

EP 1239092 A1 2002-09-11 - Wood joint for connecting two construction components, especially two beams

Title (en)

Wood joint for connecting two construction components, especially two beams

Title (de)

Holzverbinder zum Verbinden zweier Bauteile, insbesondere von zwei Balken

Title (fr)

Liaison a bois pour connecter deux composants de construction, en particulier deux poutres

Publication

EP 1239092 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01126485 A

Priority

DE 20103856 U

Abstract (en)

The connector plate is made of metal and has a first connecting flange (6) with through bores (9) and connecting projections (10) forming nailing pins. It has a second connecting flange (11) with further bores (14) and nailing projections (10). The two flanges are bolted together. The flanges are connected also by a tongue and groove joint. The tongue projection (19) on the first flange is integral with this flange and project from the edge of this flange. Both flanges are of the same thickness.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Metall-Holzverbinder (1) zum insb. stimseitigen Verbinden zweier Balken (2, 3) mit einem ersten Verbindungsflansch (6), der mit stabförmigen Verbindungsmitteln (10) mit dem ersten Balken (2) fest zu verbinden ist und mit einem zweiten Verbindungsflansch (11), der mit stabförmigen Verbindungsmitteln (10) mit dem zweiten Balken (3) fest zu verbinden ist; wobei der zweite Verbindungsflansch (11) mit wenigstens einer schlitzförmigen Ausnehmung (16) versehen ist, in welche ein angepaßter (Rast-)Vorsprung (19) des ersten Verbindungsflansches (6) einzuschieben ist; die dem Vorsprung (19) zugekehrten Seitenflächen (20, 20) der schlitzförmigen Ausnehmung (16) abgeschrägt sind; der Vorsprung (19) des ersten Verbindungsflansches (6) an seinen den Schlitz-Seitenflächen (20, 20) zugewandten Seitenflächen (23, 23) gemäß den ihnen zugekehrten Abschnitten der schlitzförmigen Ausnehmung (16) ausgebildet sind; und wobei der Vorsprung (19) integral mit dem ersten Verbindungsflansch (6) ausgebildet ist, und sich vom unteren Rand (11) des ersten Verbindungsflansches (6) aus in dessen Ebene erstreckt (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/2604 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2628 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2632 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 20103856 U1 20010621; EP 1239092 A1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-28 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040128

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030310

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI