Global Patent Index - EP 1239098 A2

EP 1239098 A2 2002-09-11 - Device for inhibiting fouling on roof surfaces

Title (en)

Device for inhibiting fouling on roof surfaces

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verhinderung von Bewuchs auf Dachflächen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour empêcher des salissures sur des surfaces de toiture

Publication

EP 1239098 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005401 A

Priority

  • DE 20104225 U
  • DE 10156319 A

Abstract (en)

The system to inhibit growth on roof surfaces (1), exposed to the weather, has at least one strip of a metallic material with a structured surface (5), as a web bonded to a carrier body (3) of plastics or a fiber material.. The structuring increases the surface area, to retain water. The metallic material is especially an electrolyte powder of high purity, with a thickness which can match easily any roof shape. The strip has a thickness of 10-1000 mu m and preferably 30-100 mu m. The structured surface is embossed to give round or elliptical recesses. The surface is treated in advance with a substance to release metal ions using H2S or Cu(NO3)2 3H2O or K2S3.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Verhinderung von Bewuchs auf der Witterung ausgesetzten Flächen, insbesondere Dachflächen, umfassend wenigstens eine Bahn aus einem metallischen Material mit einer strukturierten Oberfläche, wobei die Oberfläche vergrößert ist und damit die Verweildauer von auf der Oberfläche befindlichen fluiden Medien, insbesondere Wasser, erhöht wird. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das metallische Material, das insbesondere hochreines Elektrolytkupfer ist, eine derartige Dicke aufweist, daß es an beliebige Dachformen frei anpassbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239098 A2 20020911; EP 1239098 A3 20030129

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051217

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040318

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030728

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI