Global Patent Index - EP 1239103 A2

EP 1239103 A2 2002-09-11 - Garage door or gate

Title (en)

Garage door or gate

Title (de)

Garagentür- oder tor

Title (fr)

Porte ou portail de garage

Publication

EP 1239103 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02000480 A

Priority

  • DE 10101272 A
  • DE 10151193 A

Abstract (en)

The movable door-panel has a lock catch-bolt. At least one of the frame-struts (9) has a recess (31,34) for the catch-bolt in a closure part as thrust bearing for the catch-bolt. The closure part has a protective arrangement possessing at least one cover (36,38) forming part of the closure part when the door is in an operating position. The arrangement protects surfaces from being damaged when the door panel is banged shut.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Garagentür (1) oder -tor mit einem beweglichen Türblatt (4) bzw. Torblatt und einem Rahmen (2), der aus oberflächenbeschichteten, insbesondere pulverbeschichteten, Metallprofilen gebildete Rahmenholme (8, 9, 10, 11) aufweist. Zur Vereinfachung von Betrieb, Aufbau, Herstellung und Montage unter Erhalt und Beibehaltung eines ansprechenden optischen Äußeren der Garagentür bzw. des Garagentores wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, dass das Türblatt (4) bzw. Torblatt eine als Schnäpper ausgebildete Schlossfalle (27) hat, dass wenigstens einer der Rahmenholme (9, 8) in einem Schließbereich (26) eine Fallenaufnahme (31, 34) als Gegenlager für die Schlossfalle hat und dass der Schließbereich (26) mit einer wenigstens eine einen Teil des Schließbereichs (26) in Betriebszustand der Tür bildende Abdeckung (38, 36) aufweisende Schutzeinrichtung zum Schutz der Oberflächenbeschichtung gegen Beschädigungen bei einem Zuschlagen des Türblatts (4) bzw. Torblatts oder bei einem bauseitigen Einstellen des Schließbereichs (26) versehen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/52 (2006.01); E06B 3/76 (2006.01); E06B 7/26 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01); E06B 3/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 7/26 (2013.01); E06B 1/526 (2013.01); E06B 3/76 (2013.01); E06B 3/9632 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7044 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19939205 A1 20010405 - HOERMANN KG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239103 A2 20020911; EP 1239103 A3 20031112

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060801

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040123

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-11-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 15/02 A

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI