Global Patent Index - EP 1239106 A2

EP 1239106 A2 2002-09-11 - Anti-intrusion security device

Title (en)

Anti-intrusion security device

Title (de)

Einbruchhemmende Sicherheitsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité anti-intrusion

Publication

EP 1239106 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02075839 A

Priority

IT MI20010130 U

Abstract (en)

An anti-intrusion security device is disclosed, comprising a first movable rod (2) arranged inside a fixed rod (3) operatively associated to mechanical means allowing its positioning and translation, wherein one or more clamps of said first rod (2) are provided, controlled by a lock (6) integrated with said rod. The device may be operated manually or powered with or without remote control. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 1/00; E05B 47/00; E05C 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05C 1/02 (2006.01); E05B 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 13/046 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05C 1/02 (2013.01); E05B 65/0021 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239106 A2 20020911; EP 1239106 A3 20040114; IT MI20010130 U1 20020909; IT MI20010130 V0 20010308

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040715

2004-11-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05C 1/00 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05C 1/02 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 47/00 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI