Global Patent Index - EP 1239110 A1

EP 1239110 A1 2002-09-11 - Fixture for a roller shutter

Title (en)

Fixture for a roller shutter

Title (de)

Antriebslagerhalter einer Rolllade

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un mecanisme de volet roulant

Publication

EP 1239110 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004981 A

Priority

DE 20104119 U

Abstract (en)

The blind (7) may be attached to the octagonal roller (6) by straps. The roller has a toothed drive device (8) at one end. It engages a C-shaped spring (15) with a projection facing away from the open end of the C-shape. The spring engages a bearing arrangement (1) fastened on the inside wall of one of the end covers (3).

Abstract (de)

Um eine Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln von Rolllade, Markise oder dgl. mit einem in einer der Blendkappen (3, 5;4) angeordneten Antriebslagerhalter (2), der eine Hohlwelle (6) mit Antriebseinheit (8) aufnimmt, und der mit einem Antriebs-Lagerkörper (21) versehen ist, oder um diesen Antriebslagerhalter (1) so auszubilden, dass die Montage weniger aufwendig wird, ist entweder der Antriebs-Lagerkörper (11) auf einer Lagerkörper-Halteplatte (13) angeordnet, die unter Vorspannung und verdrehungsfrei in die Blendkappe (3, 5; 4) einlegbar ist oder auf dem Antriebslagerkörper (21) oder auf der Lagerkörper-Halteplatte (23) sind wenigstens zwei Haltestifte (26, 27, 28) im Abstand voneinander angeordnet und in der Blendkappe (3, 5; 4) wenigstens zwei Stiftausnehmungen (43,1, .... 43.n, 44.1, ..., 44.n, 45.1, ..., 45.n) im Abstand voneinander eingebracht sind, in die die Haltestifte (26, 27, 28) beim Einsetzen der Lagerkörper-Halteplatte (23) in die Blendkappe (4, 5) einschiebbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/174

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/174 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/174 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20104119 U1 20010426; EP 1239110 A1 20020911; PL 352648 A1 20020909

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021012

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI