Global Patent Index - EP 1239123 A2

EP 1239123 A2 2002-09-11 - Deactivable valve tappet for transmission of cam lift on a pushrod

Title (en)

Deactivable valve tappet for transmission of cam lift on a pushrod

Title (de)

Schaltbarer Stössel zur direkten Übertragung eines Nockenhubes auf eine Stösselstange

Title (fr)

Poussoir désactivable pour transmission d'une courbe de came sur une tige de culbuteur

Publication

EP 1239123 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02001304 A

Priority

DE 10111512 A

Abstract (en)

The switchable tappet (1) has a coil compression spring (15) acting as a lost motion spring acting on an internal element axially from a casing (2). The internal element has a lug (15a) projecting out of the casing. The coil compression spring fits round the lug, so that the total weight of the pushrod is reduced and the casing is shorter.

Abstract (de)

Vorgeschlagen ist ein schaltbarer Stößel (1) zur direkten Übertragung eines Nockenhubes auf eine Stößelstange. Erfindungsgemäß ist eine als Lost-Motion-Feder verwendete Schraubendruckfeder (15) zur Beaufschlagung des Innenelements (4) axial aus einem Gehäuse (2) verlagert. Hierfür hat das Innenelement (4) einen aus dem Gehäuse (2) heraus geführten Ansatz (15a), welcher von der Schraubendruckfeder (15) umschlossen ist. Diese Maßnahme trägt zur Minimierung der Gesamtmasse des schaltbaren Stößels (1) bei, da die Baulänge des Gehäuses (2) verkürzt ist. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00; F01L 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/14 (2006.01); F01L 1/24 (2006.01); F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0031 (2013.01); F01L 1/146 (2013.01); F01L 1/2422 (2013.01); F01L 13/0005 (2013.01); F01L 2105/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19844202 A1 20000330 - SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239123 A2 20020911; EP 1239123 A3 20030108; EP 1239123 B1 20031008; DE 10111512 A1 20020912; ES 2208615 T3 20040616

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50200063

- Effective date: 20150210

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50200063

- Effective date: 20140213

2014-03-27 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50200063

- Effective date: 20140213

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50200063

- Effective date: 20120828

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG, 91074 HERZOGENAURACH, DE

- Document: DE 50200063

- Effective date: 20120828

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070118

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-09-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 5

2006-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060118

2005-02-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 4

2005-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050110

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2208615 T3

2004-02-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-01-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200063 P 20031113

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030221

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2003-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01L 13/00 A, 7F 01L 1/14 B, 7F 01L 1/24 B

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020118

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI