Global Patent Index - EP 1239125 A1

EP 1239125 A1 2002-09-11 - Device for mounting a first component, in particular an oil pan, on a second component, in particular an engine block of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Device for mounting a first component, in particular an oil pan, on a second component, in particular an engine block of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Lagern eines ersten Bauteils, insbesondere einer Ölwanne, an einem zweiten Bauteil, insbesondere einem Motorblock einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le montage d'un premier élément, en particulier un carter d'huile, sur un deuxième élément, en particulier un bloc cylindre de moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 1239125 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003390 A

Priority

DE 10110532 A

Abstract (en)

The sump to engine block fitting device (1) has a first support body fixable or fixed by a connector to the sump, and a second support body (3) fixable or fixed to the engine block and spaced out from the first support body. An elastic body (4) provides an oil-tight seal between the first and second supporting bodies.

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung (1) zum Lagern eines ersten Bauteils, insbesondere einer Ölwanne, an einem zweiten Bauteil, insbesondere einem Motorblock einer Brennkraftmaschine, gekennzeichnet durch einen ersten Stützkörper (2) welcher über erste Verbindungsmittel (11) an dem ersten Bauteil festlegbar oder festgelegt ist, einen zweiten Stützkörper (3), welcher über zweite Verbindungsmittel an dem zweiten Bauteil festlegbar ist und welcher von dem ersten Stützkörper (2) beabstandet ist, und einen elastischen Körper (4), welcher ersten und zweiten Stützkörper (2, 3) flüssigkeitsdicht verbindet und den ersten Stützkörper (2) an dem zweiten Stützkörper (3) elastisch bewegbar festlegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 11/00; F02B 77/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/00 (2006.01); F02B 77/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/0004 (2013.01); F02B 77/13 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0054 (2013.01); F01M 2011/0062 (2013.01); F05C 2225/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3712052 A1 19871022 - FORD WERKE AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239125 A1 20020911; EP 1239125 B1 20060614; DE 10110532 A1 20020926; DE 50207150 D1 20060727

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-01-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060925

2006-09-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060914

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207150 P 20060727

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-06-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-05-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR MOUNTING A FIRST COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR AN OIL PAN, ON A SECOND COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR AN ENGINE BLOCK OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI