Global Patent Index - EP 1239128 A1

EP 1239128 A1 2002-09-11 - Vehicle silencer

Title (en)

Vehicle silencer

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeug-Schalldämpfer

Title (fr)

Silencieux pour les véhicules

Publication

EP 1239128 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02003434 A

Priority

DE 10107040 A

Abstract (en)

The silencer comprises a housing with a double-layered metal sleeve (1) with an air ring gap (12) formed between the inner plate (8) and outer plate (7) of the sleeve and defined by spacers (11). At least or just one ventilation hole (13) is provided in the inner or outer plate. The spacers can be formed in the surface structure of the inner plate or outer plate.

Abstract (de)

Ein Schalldämpfer für die Abgasanlage eines verbrennungsmotorisch angetriebenen Kraftfahrzeugs umfaßt ein Gehäuse mit einem aus einem zweilagigen Blech gefertigten Mantel (1). Zwischen dem Innenblech (8) und dem Außenblech (7) des Mantels (1) besteht ein durch Abstandshalter definierter Luftringspalt (12). In dem Innenblech (8) oder in dem Außenblech (7) ist mindestens ein Entlüftungsloch (13) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/14; F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/14 (2010.01); F01N 13/16 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/18 (2013.01); F01N 13/14 (2013.01); F01N 13/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239128 A1 20020911; DE 10107040 A1 20020829

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071024

2007-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ILNSEHER, PETER

2007-04-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETER ILNSEHER

2006-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041109

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021012

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI