Global Patent Index - EP 1239141 A1

EP 1239141 A1 2002-09-11 - Mixer housing arrangement for a combustion engine

Title (en)

Mixer housing arrangement for a combustion engine

Title (de)

Mischgehäuseanordnung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Aménagement d'un mélangeur pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1239141 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02001759 A

Priority

DE 10111391 A

Abstract (en)

The mixing housing assembly for an internal combustion motor, with an air intake channel section (3) containing an exhaust gas return (5), is composed of a housing section (8) with corresponding seals (9,10). The cut-outs (11-14) in the seals match the flow cross sections of the entry and exit openings. The housing (2) is a casting. A throttle flap (4) is upstream of the exhaust gas return, to control the air flow throughput.

Abstract (de)

Mischgehäuseanordnung für eine Brennkraftmaschine, mit einem Gehäuse, das einen Ansaugkanalabschnitt aufweist, in den eine Abgasrückführeinleitanordnung mit einer Einlaßöffnung und einer Auslaßöffnung hineinragt und wobei die Abgasrückführung durch ein Abgasrückführventil steuerbar ist wobei die Abgasrückführeinleitanordnung (5) aus einem Gehäuseteil (8) und einem damit korrespondierenden Abdichtelement (9; 10) besteht, wobei durch Aussparungen (11, 12; 13, 14) im Abdichtelement (9; 10) die Strömungsquerschnitte der Einlaßöffnung (6) und der Auslaßöffnung (7) bestimmt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/11 (2016.01); F02M 26/21 (2016.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10222 (2013.01); F02M 26/11 (2016.02); F02M 26/21 (2016.02); F02D 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239141 A1 20020911; EP 1239141 B1 20040331; DE 10111391 A1 20020912; ES 2214452 T3 20040916

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110126

2012-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120305

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110125

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110125

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110125

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2214452 T3

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200317 P 20040506

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030326

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI