Global Patent Index - EP 1239143 A2

EP 1239143 A2 2002-09-11 - Pressure sampling device for sampling an internal pressure of an intake pipe of a combustion engine

Title (en)

Pressure sampling device for sampling an internal pressure of an intake pipe of a combustion engine

Title (de)

Druckprobenahmevorrichtung für interne Druckprobenahme in einem Ansaugrohr einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'échantillonnage de pression pour échantillonner une pression interne d'un tube d'admission d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1239143 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02004229 A

Priority

JP 2001066754 A

Abstract (en)

In order to provide an internal pressure sampling device for an intake pipe of an internal combustion engine, capable of sampling the pressure within the intake pipe 10 in a highly precise manner even when the pressure sensor 14 is located away from the intake pipe 10, a sampling pipe 11 is provided on the intake pipe 10 of the internal combustion engine and communicates with the intake pipe 10 of the internal combustion engine, a damper 12 is fitted to one end of the sampling pipe 11, and a pressure sensor 14 is provided on the sampling pipe 11 further towards the side of a pressure takeoff or equalisation opening 11a of the sampling pipe 11 than the damper 12. An absorber 13 communicating with the sampling pipe 11 via the damper 12 is provided at one end of the sampling pipe 11.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01L 19/00 (2006.01); F02B 27/00 (2006.01); F02D 35/00 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01); G01L 23/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10295 (2013.01); F02M 35/1038 (2013.01); F02M 35/1255 (2013.01); F02M 35/1272 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239143 A2 20020911; EP 1239143 A3 20070314; EP 1239143 B1 20080528; DE 60226798 D1 20080710; JP 2002266676 A 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2009-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090303

2008-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60226798 P 20080710

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2007-11-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2007-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070405

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI