Global Patent Index - EP 1239146 A2

EP 1239146 A2 2002-09-11 - Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de carburant pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1239146 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02001824 A

Priority

DE 10108719 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10108719A1] The system includes a control valve (30), connected to a relief cavity by a control connection which can be closed by an auxiliary valve with a piston (45) (the control member), which moves synchronously with the injection-valve member (60), longitudinally, and has an end sector on it with a control edge.

Abstract (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem für Brennkraftmaschinen mit einem Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (1), das ein Gehäuse aufweist, in dem in einer Bohrung (62) ein Ventilglied (60) axial beweglich angeordnet ist. Das Ventilglied (60) wird durch den Kraftstoffdruck in einem Druckraum (64) hydraulisch gesteuert und ist entgegen einer Schließkraft längsverschiebbar, wodurch es wenigstens eine Einspritzöffnung (68) steuert. Im Gehäuse ist ein Steuerventil (30) angeordnet, durch das die Verbindung des Druckraums (64) mit einer Kraftstoffhochdruckquelle (10) und/oder eines Entlastungsraums (72) gesteuert wird. Das Steuerventil (30) ist mit dem Entlastungsraum (72) über eine Steuerverbindung verbunden, die durch ein zusätzliches Ventil verschließbar ist, welches als Steuerglied einen Kolben (45) aufweist, der sich synchron mit dem Ventilglied (60) in Längsrichtung bewegt und der einen Endabschnitt (44) aufweist, an dem eine Steuerkante (93) ausgebildet ist, welche nach einem Teil des Gesamthubs des Kolbens (45) in einen Steuerabschnitt (48) der Steuerverbindung eintaucht und diese verschließt (Fig. 1). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46; F02M 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0007 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239146 A2 20020911; EP 1239146 A3 20040121; DE 10108719 A1 20020905

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050514

2005-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB TR

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 47/02 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/00 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/46 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI