Global Patent Index - EP 1239149 A2

EP 1239149 A2 2002-09-11 - Fuel injector arrangement for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injector arrangement for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injecteur de carburant pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1239149 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004091 A

Priority

DE 10110602 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel injector, for an internal combustion motor, has a restricted passage (50) with at least one throttle, which links the control pressure zone (46) of the fuel injection valve (12) with the high pressure fuel pump (10). The throttle has an elastic distortion so that it gives a larger flow cross section, with an increasing pressure drop before and after the restricted passage. The throttle is slitted at least partially, to give the elastic distortion.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzeinrichtung weist eine Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) für jeden Zylinder der Brennkraftmaschine auf, die mit einem an der Brennkraftmaschine angeordneten Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) verbunden ist, das ein Einspritzventilglied (28) aufweist, durch das wenigstens eine Einspritzöffnung (32) gesteuert wird und das durch den von der Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) erzeugten Hochdruck gegen eine Schließkraft in einer Öffnungsrichtung (29) zur Freigabe der wenigstens einen Einspritzöffnung (32) bewegbar ist. Es ist ein Steuerventil (52) vorgesehen, durch das zur Steuerung der Kraftstoffeinspritzung zumindest mittelbar eine Verbindung der Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) mit einem Entlastungsraum (24) gesteuert wird. Das Kraftstoffeinspritzventil (12) weist einen Steuerdruckraum (46) auf, der über eine Drosselstelle (50) mit der Kraftstoffhochdruckpumpe (10) verbunden ist, wobei das Einspritzventilglied (28) zumindest mittelbar durch den im Steuerdruckraum (46) herrschenden Druck in einer Schließrichtung beaufschlagt ist. Die Drosselstelle (50) weist wenigstens ein Drosselelement (62;162) auf, das derart elastisch verformbar ist, daß es mit zunehmendem Druckgefälle vor und nach der Drosselstelle (50) einen größeren Durchflußquerschnitt freigibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 63/00; F02M 57/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/36 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/205 (2013.01); F02M 59/366 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19939419 A1 20010301 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239149 A2 20020911; EP 1239149 A3 20031119; DE 10110602 A1 20020912

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050830

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040519

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI