Global Patent Index - EP 1239161 A1

EP 1239161 A1 2002-09-11 - Thermal level detection in motor pump unit

Title (en)

Thermal level detection in motor pump unit

Title (de)

Pumpenanlage mit thermischer Flüssigkeitsniveaudetektion

Title (fr)

Groupe motopompe à détection thermique de niveau

Publication

EP 1239161 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290538 A

Priority

FR 0103010 A

Abstract (en)

The ditch drainage motor-pump has a housing (11) for an electronic control circuit and heaters for the motor. The housing has a sensor (8) to determine a change of curve in the temperature rise as a function of time. Operating and stopping controls for the motor (3) are actuated when a change of angle is detected.

Abstract (fr)

Ce groupe motopompe comprend un bloc (11) électronique de commande et des moyens de chauffage du moteur et le bloc (11) comporte des moyens de détermination d'un changement de la courbe de la température relevé par un capteur (8) de température en fonction du temps et des moyens de commande de marche/arrêt du moteur (3) lorsque les moyens de détermination détectent un changement de pente. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/0218 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239161 A1 20020911; FR 2821894 A1 20020913; FR 2821894 B1 20030516

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071218

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KSB S.A.S

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI