Global Patent Index - EP 1239167 A1

EP 1239167 A1 2002-09-11 - Hydraulic lifting device

Title (en)

Hydraulic lifting device

Title (de)

Hydraulische Hubvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage hydraulique

Publication

EP 1239167 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02004809 A

Priority

DE 10110764 A

Abstract (en)

The lifting gear (10) has a motor (M) driving a pump (P) which draws oil from the reservoir (11). A bypass system (L1) with valves (18,19) may return some of the oil to the tank suction valve (12). The system includes a non-return valve (14) and a shutoff valve (15). There may be two actuator cylinders (13) with position sensors.

Abstract (de)

Eine hydraulische Hubvorrichtung insbesondere für batteriegetriebene Flurförderzeuge umfaßt eine von einem Elektromotor (M) antreibbaren Pumpe (P), mittels der im Lasthebebetrieb zumindest einem hydraulischen Hubzylinder (13) Hydrauliköl aus einem Vorratsbehälter (11) über eine Zuführleitung (L1) zuführbar ist, wobei in einem saugseitigen Abschnitt (L1.1) der Zuführleitung (L1) ein Nachsaugventil (12) angeordnet ist. Das Hydrauliköl kann im Lastsenkbetrieb von dem Hubzylinder (13) über eine Rückführleitung (L4.1,L4.2,L1.3,L2,L1.1,L1.2,L6,L7,L5) unter Durchströmen eines den als Generator arbeitenden Elektromotor (M) antreibenden Hydromotors (P) in den Vorratsbehälter (11) zurückfördert werden und es ist eine Steuervorrichtung (16) zur Änderung der Hub- bzw. Senkgeschwindigkeit des Hubzylinders vorgesehen, wobei die Zuführleitung (L1) eine Zweigleitung (L2) aufweist, über die im Lasthebebetrieb Hydrauliköl aus der Zuführleitung abzweigbar ist und die in dem saugseitigen Abschnitt (L1.1) der Zuführleitung (L1) stromab des Nachsaugventils (12) mündet. Dabei ist vorgesehen, daß das Nachsaugventil (12) in Abhängigkeit von dem in der Zweigleitung (L2) herrschenden Druck zwischen einer Stellung freien Durchflusses und einer Rückschlagventilstellung schaltbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 21/14; B66F 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2013.01); F15B 21/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239167 A1 20020911; EP 1239167 B1 20050112; DE 10110764 A1 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2017-12-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20171130

2017-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170303

2017-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170302

2017-10-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-12-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20141113 AND 20141119

2014-06-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BT PRODUCTS AB, SE

- Effective date: 20140519

2014-04-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BT PRODUCTS AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DAMBACH LAGERSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG, 76571 GAGGENAU, DE

- Document: DE 50201975

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-04-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201975

- Representative's name: LICHTI PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-04-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50201975

- Representative's name: LICHTI - PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140227

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-03-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50201975 P 20050217

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030227

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI