Global Patent Index - EP 1239196 A2

EP 1239196 A2 2002-09-11 - Piston accumulator

Title (en)

Piston accumulator

Title (de)

Kolbenspeicher

Title (fr)

Accumulateur à piston

Publication

EP 1239196 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02000825 A

Priority

DE 10111332 A

Abstract (en)

A piston storage unit, comprises a separation piston which can move to and fro in a cylinder, and has at least two O-rings which are spaced apart axially. One O-ring is located against an area containing a liquid medium and consists of a low temperature elastomer. The second ring is located against an area containing gas and is located in a groove. <??>A piston storage unit, comprises a separation piston which can move to and fro in a cylinder, and has at least two O-rings which are spaced apart axially. One O-ring is located against an area containing a liquid medium and consists of a low temperature elastomer. The second ring is located against an area containing gas and is located in a groove. The sealing lips (9,10) of the second ring are pressed against the sealing surfaces using a metallic tensioning spring (11).

Abstract (de)

Kolbenspeicher, umfassend zumindest einen Trennkolben (1), der in einem Zylinder (2) axial hin- und herbewegbar ist und zur Abdichtung eines mit einem gasförmigen Medium gefüllten Raums (3) gegen einen mit einem flüssigen Medium gefüllten Raum (4) außenumfangsseitig zumindest zwei mit axialem Abstand zueinander benachbart angeordnete Dichtringe (5, 6) aufweist, wobei einer der Dichtringe (5, 6) als O-Ring (7) ausgebildet ist. Der O-Ring (7) ist auf der dem Raum (4) mit flüssigem Medium zugewandten Seite angeordnet und besteht aus einem Tieftemperatur-Elastomer, wobei der zweite Dichtring (6) auf der dem Raum (3) mit gasförmigem Medium zugewandten Seite als Nutring-Dichtung (8) ausgebildet ist, deren Dichtlippen (9, 10) durch eine metallische Spannfeder (11) an die abzudichtenden Flächen (12, 13) von Trennkolben (1) und / oder Zylinder (2) anlegbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 1/24; F16J 15/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 1/24 (2013.01); F15B 2201/205 (2013.01); F15B 2201/312 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3619457 A1 19871217 - BOLENZ & SCHAEFER MASCHF [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239196 A2 20020911; EP 1239196 A3 20040915; DE 10111332 A1 20020919; DE 10111332 B4 20040819

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-07-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-06-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 15B 1/24 A

2004-09-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16J 15/32 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI