Global Patent Index - EP 1239214 A2

EP 1239214 A2 2002-09-11 - Pillar-shaped indicator lamp

Title (en)

Pillar-shaped indicator lamp

Title (de)

Anzeigeleuchtensäule

Title (fr)

Colonne de signalisation lumineuse

Publication

EP 1239214 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02005413 A

Priority

DE 10111594 A

Abstract (en)

Display lights comprise a number of detachable light sections that form a column when joined together. Each light section has a transparent housing (25), an insert unit (27) with electrical conductors (47, 49) connecting to a display light (33). Connecting means between the sections are provided by pins (39, 41) and sockets (43) that extend in the axial direction. When the sections are joined together the pins are inserted in the sockets and additional snap connections (61, 67) join the sections together.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anzeigeleuchte (1) mit lösbar übereinander angeordneten Leuchtenabschnitten (11 bis 17), die je einen transparenten Gehäuseabschnitt (25) mit einer Einsatzeinheit umfassen, wobei die Einsatzeinheit (27) elektrische Leitungen (47,49) aufweist, die über elektrische Verbindungsmitteln mit Leitungen (47,49) der jeweils darunter angeordneten Einsatzeinheit (27) oder des Sockels (9) der Anzeigenleuchte (1) in Verbindung stehen, und wobei die Einsatzeinheiten (27) ferner Aufnahmeeinrichtungen (31) für die Anzeigeleuchten (33) vorsehen, die mit den Leitungen (47,49) in Verbindung stehen. Die Erfindung kennzeichnet sich dadurch, dass die Verbindungsmittel sich in axialer Richtung erstreckende Stifte (39,41) und Buchsen (43,44) umfassen und dass die Leuchtenabschnitte (11 bis 17) mit dem jeweils darunter angeordneten Leuchtenabschnitt (11 bis 17) oder Sockel (9) derart axial versteckbar sind, dass die Stifte (39,41) und Buchsen (43,44) die Leitungen (47,49) der Einsatzeinheit (27) mit den jeweils darunter angeordneten Leitungen (47,49) der darunter liegenden Einsatzeinheit (27) verbinden, wobei die Leuchtenabschnitte (11 bis 17) mit dem jeweils darunter liegenden Leuchtenabschnitt (11 bis 17) oder dem Sockel (9) über Schnappverbindungen (61,67) verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/00; G07C 3/00; G08B 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01); G07C 3/00 (2006.01); G08B 5/36 (2006.01); F21V 15/01 (2006.01); F21W 111/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/06 (2013.01); F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21W 2111/00 (2013.01); F21W 2111/02 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2211801 B2 19760219

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239214 A2 20020911; EP 1239214 A3 20050406; EP 1239214 B1 20071114; AT 378550 T 20071115; DE 10111594 A1 20020919; DE 50211179 D1 20071227; US 2002172040 A1 20021121; US 6604838 B2 20030812

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071114

2010-07-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080308

2010-02-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071114

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080308

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071114

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080215

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071114

2008-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071114

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080815

2008-10-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KARL JAUTZ ELEKTROTECHNISCHE SPEZIALFABRIK K.G.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080414

2008-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071114

2008-06-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

2008-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080225

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071114

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080214

2007-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50211179 P 20071227

2007-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-11-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV MK RO SI

2007-11-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 8/00 20060101AFI20070214BHEP

2007-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07C 3/00 20060101ALI20070214BHEP

2007-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G08B 5/36 20060101ALI20070214BHEP

2007-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21W 111/00 20060101ALI20070214BHEP

2005-12-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-12-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20051006

- Countries: LT

2005-12-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20051006

- Countries: LV

2005-12-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20051006

- Countries: MK

2005-12-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20051006

- Countries: RO

2005-12-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20051006

- Countries: SI

2005-11-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051006

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI