Global Patent Index - EP 1239220 A2

EP 1239220 A2 2002-09-11 - Method for Controlling a Gas Combustion Apparatus, particularly a Gas Heating Apparatus

Title (en)

Method for Controlling a Gas Combustion Apparatus, particularly a Gas Heating Apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Regelung eines Gasverbrennungsgerätes, insbesondere eines Gasheizgerätes

Title (fr)

Procédé de régulation d'un appareil de combustion à gaz, en particulier pour le chauffage

Publication

EP 1239220 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01129917 A

Priority

DE 10111077 A

Abstract (en)

The burner system (1) incorporates a gas burner (2) inside a combustion chamber (3). There is a lambda sensor (9) in the flue which feeds a signal (11) to a control computer (10). The computer incorporates a microprocessor (13) and a store (14) and has first and second signal lights (15,16). A control lead (12) connects the computer to a control valve (4) which regulates the air and gas inputs (5,6) to the burner.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Gasverbrennungsgerät (1), insbesondere ein Gasheizgerät, mit einem Stellglied (4), mit dem ein Mischungsverhältnis von Brenngas und Luft einstellbar ist, mit einem Sensor (9), mit dem ein λ-Wert sensierbar ist, der mit dem Sauerstoffgehalt des Abgases korreliert, und mit einem Regelsystem (10), das mit dem Stellglied (4) und dem Sensor (9) gekoppelt ist und das eine λ-geführte Regelung des Stellgliedes (4) ermöglicht, wobei das Regelsystem (10) die am Stellglied (4) eingestellte Stellgröße und die Grenzwerte der am Stellglied (4) einstellbaren Stellgrößen kennt und wobei das Regelsystem (10) aus dem historischen zeitlichen Verlauf der Stellgröße einen Ausfallzeitpunkt berechnet, bei dem die Stellgröße einen ihrer Grenzwerte erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/60; F23N 1/02; F23N 5/00; F23N 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/24 (2006.01); F23N 1/02 (2006.01); F23N 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 5/242 (2013.01); F23N 1/02 (2013.01); F23N 5/006 (2013.01); F23N 2025/30 (2013.01); F23N 2031/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239220 A2 20020911; EP 1239220 A3 20021030; EP 1239220 B1 20070103; DE 10111077 A1 20020926; DE 10111077 C2 20031106; DE 50111790 D1 20070215

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50111790 P 20070215

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-01-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A GAS COMBUSTION APPARATUS, PARTICULARLY A GAS HEATING APPARATUS

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23N 5/24 A

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI