Global Patent Index - EP 1239221 A2

EP 1239221 A2 2002-09-11 - Fuel supply apparatus for mobile heating device

Title (en)

Fuel supply apparatus for mobile heating device

Title (de)

Brennstoffzuführeinrichtung für ein mobiles Heizgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation en carburant pour système de chauffage mobile

Publication

EP 1239221 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004609 A

Priority

DE 10111004 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel supply appliance has at least one chamber (20,22) into which leads a fuel-pipe (24) with an admission pressure section (26), and from which leads a pipe (28A,B) with an ultimate pressure section (28). Between the admission and ultimate pressure sections is a dispenser (10) possessing a movable piston (18)movably mounted in a cylinder (12,14). The two chambers with changeable volume are on o opposite ends of the piston. The dispenser directly raises the fuel's ultimate pressure to that required by the burner.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem mobilen Heizgerät insbesondere die Brennstoffzuführeinrichtung kostengünstiger zu gestalten, umfasst diese eine Brennstoffzuführeinrichtung, die wenigstens eine Kammer (20, 22) aufweist, in die eine Brennstoffleitung (24) mit einem Vordruckabschnitt (26) einmündet und aus der eine Leitung (28A) mit einem Enddruckabschnitt (28) ausmündet. Zwischen dem Vordruckabschnitt (26) und dem Enddruckabschnitt (28) ist eine einen bewegbaren Kolben (18) aufweisende Dosiereinrichtung (10) angeordnet, mittels der der Brennstoff unmittelbar auf den vom Brenner benötigten Enddruck erhöht wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 5/04; F23K 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 7/04 (2006.01); F23K 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/142 (2013.01); F04B 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239221 A2 20020911; EP 1239221 A3 20021002; EP 1239221 B1 20050615; EP 1239221 B8 20050810; DE 10111004 A1 20020926

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50203392

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50203392

2013-08-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50203392

- Representative's name: ROTHKOPF PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2006-06-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-08-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-08-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WEBASTO AG

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50203392 P 20050721

2005-07-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040707

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEBASTO THERMOSYSTEME INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23K 5/04 A, 7F 23K 5/14 B, 7F 04B 7/04 B, 7B 60H 1/22 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI