Global Patent Index - EP 1239222 A2

EP 1239222 A2 2002-09-11 - Ceramic heater device and method for manufacturing the device

Title (en)

Ceramic heater device and method for manufacturing the device

Title (de)

Keramikheizer und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif chauffant céramique, et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1239222 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02251651 A

Priority

JP 2001066049 A

Abstract (en)

A ceramic heater 2 is arranged in a metallic cylinder member 3 by forming a convergent taper portion 2t at the leading end 2a of the ceramic heater 2 and by positioning the leading end 3a of the metallic cylinder member 3 on the leading end side of a taper starting point P1 of the taper portion 2t. Solder is applied in the clearance between the inner circumference 3d of the metallic cylinder member 3 and the outer circumference 2b of the heater 2. A solder layer 10 applied is made to exist on the leading end side of the taper starting point P1 of the taper portion 2t, too. The thick solder layer 10 existing on the leading end side performs the action of preventing a cut or broken off portion of the ceramic heater from separating or sliding out.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00; H05B 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01); F23Q 7/22 (2006.01); H05B 3/14 (2006.01); H05B 3/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01); H05B 3/141 (2013.01); F23Q 2007/004 (2013.01); H05B 2203/027 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239222 A2 20020911; EP 1239222 A3 20060823; EP 1239222 B1 20080227; EP 1239222 B2 20130116; DE 60225200 D1 20080410; DE 60225200 T2 20090326; DE 60225200 T3 20130328; JP 2002270349 A 20020920; JP 4632565 B2 20110223

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20130116

2013-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2013-01-16 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60225200

2011-04-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BORGWARNER BERU SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-07-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-01-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20081127

2008-12-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60225200 P 20080410

2008-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2007-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI