Global Patent Index - EP 1239224 A1

EP 1239224 A1 2002-09-11 - Built-in electric houshold oven

Title (en)

Built-in electric houshold oven

Title (de)

Elektrischer Haushaltofen für den Einbau

Title (fr)

Four électrique domestique encastrable

Publication

EP 1239224 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290550 A

Priority

FR 0103105 A

Abstract (en)

The built in electric cooker has a cooking chamber (11) in a casing (20) defining, with the chamber, a gap (21) for air circulation. The casing has a lower panel (25) to define, with the lower face of the recess (5), a pathway for air circulation under the cooking chamber. The lower panel has a closure wall (30) between the air pathway and the gap, with an opening (3) with an axis parallel to the direction of flow.

Abstract (fr)

Un four électrique domestique encastrable dans une niche comprend une enceinte de cuisson (11) logée dans une carrosserie de four (20) définissant avec l'enceinte de cuisson un espace de circulation d'air (21), la carrosserie comprenant une tôle inférieure (25) adaptée à définir avec un plan inférieur (6a) de la niche (5) un couloir de circulation d'air (26) sous l'enceinte cuisson (11). La tôle inférieure (25) comprend une paroi d'obturation (30) entre le couloir de circulation d'air (26) et l'espace de circulation d'air (21), la paroi d'obturation (30) comprenant au moins une ouverture (31) d'axe parallèle à la direction (F) de circulation de l'air dans ledit couloir (26). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/006 (2013.01); F24C 15/2007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239224 A1 20020911; EP 1239224 B1 20051026; DE 60206822 D1 20051201; DE 60206822 T2 20060629; ES 2253496 T3 20060601; FR 2821920 A1 20020913; FR 2821920 B1 20030613

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160307

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170426

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160306

2017-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60206822

2016-05-27 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Effective date: 20160420

2016-03-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-03-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FAGORBRANDT SAS, RUEIL-MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 60206822

2016-03-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60206822

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2016-03-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150409

- Year of fee payment: 14

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRANDT INDUSTRIES, RUEIL MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 60206822

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRANDT INDUSTRIES, RUEIL MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 60206822

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60206822

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60206822

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2011-11-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100306

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100306

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2253496 T3

2006-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060202

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60206822 P 20051201

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-03-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030122

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI