Global Patent Index - EP 1239225 A2

EP 1239225 A2 2002-09-11 - Hinge for lids of electric household appliances

Title (en)

Hinge for lids of electric household appliances

Title (de)

Scharnier für Abdeckplatten von elektrischen Haushaltsgeräten

Title (fr)

Charnière pour panneaux de couverture d'appareils électroménagers

Publication

EP 1239225 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02003190 A

Priority

IT PD20010043 A

Abstract (en)

A right or left hinge for lids for electric household appliances, having a structure of the type that comprises a supporting head (10) provided with a partially threaded pivot (11) inserted in a helical spring (20) which acts by torsion and whose ends (21,22) are rigidly coupled respectively to the head (10) and to an adjustment nut (25) screwed onto the pivot thread (12), a lock nut (26), being further screwed onto the pivot thread (12), to lock the adjustment nut (25). The helical spring (20) is rigidly coupled, with its end (21) that lies opposite with respect to the adjustment nut (25), to a cam element (14) through which the pivot (11) passes, and a rod (16) cooperating with the cam element (14) is provided to convert rotary motion into axial translational motion, the rod (16) being perpendicular to the pivot axis and being pushed by a compression spring (27) arranged between the rod (16) and a portion of the head (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/02; E05F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/12 (2006.01); F24C 15/02 (2006.01); E05F 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/1215 (2013.01); E05F 1/1253 (2013.01); F24C 15/023 (2013.01); E05F 5/08 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/212 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/264 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/416 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/308 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

IT 1000043 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239225 A2 20020911; EP 1239225 A3 20030702; IT PD20010043 A1 20020827

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051014

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050221

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI