Global Patent Index - EP 1239231 A2

EP 1239231 A2 2002-09-11 - SYSTEM FOR TEMPERATURE TREATMENT WITH TRANSFER MEDIUM

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR TEMPERATURE TREATMENT WITH TRANSFER MEDIUM

Title (de)

Anordnung für Temperaturbehandlung mit Übertragungsmedium

Title (fr)

Système pour traitement thermique avec matière de transfert

Publication

EP 1239231 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02075377 A

Priority

NL 1017198 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a ystem for treating the temperature of a space in a building, comprising: a closed pipe system for circulating a transfer medium under pressure during operation of the system, a heat exchanger connected to the pipe system for acting on the temperature of the transfer medium; at least one additional heat exchanger in the space for treating and connected to the pipe system for treating the temperature of the air in the space by means of the transfer medium supplied via the pipe system; and replenishing means connected to the pipe system for selective replenishing of the transfer medium in the pipe system to maintain the pressure thereof above a predetermined minimum pressure, wherein the replenishing means are connected via a controllable valve to a replenishing source under pressure, and comprise a sensor to detect the need for replenishing of the transfer medium, which comprise a protection against replenishing of the transfer medium when there is leakage in the pipe system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1083 (2013.01); F24D 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239231 A2 20020911; EP 1239231 A3 20031126; EP 1239231 B1 20081224; DE 60230465 D1 20090205; NL 1017198 C1 20020729

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170128

2018-02-15 [REG BE MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170801

2017-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-09-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60230465

2017-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170131

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-12-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090925

2009-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60230465 P 20090205

2008-12-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT NL

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060329

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT NL

2004-07-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLAMCO B.V.

2004-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CNOSSEN, JAN HENK

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI