Global Patent Index - EP 1239237 A2

EP 1239237 A2 2002-09-11 - Fan heater

Title (en)

Fan heater

Title (de)

Heizlüfter

Title (fr)

Thermoventilateur

Publication

EP 1239237 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004174 A

Priority

DE 10110243 A

Abstract (en)

The heater has a casing (4) containing fresh air intake apertures (11), hot air output apertures (13) and a fan wheel (21) to create an air flow (44). The housing also contains a heating element (19) to heat the air flowing through. The fan wheel is located between the air intake apertures and the heating element.

Abstract (de)

Heizlüfter mit einem Gehäuse (4), in dem Gehäuse (4) angeordneten Lufteintritts-Öffnungen (11) zur Zuführung von Frischluft, in dem Gehäuse (4) angeordneten Luftaustritts-Öffnungen (13) zur Abgabe von erwärmter Luft, einem zwischen den Lufteintritts-Öffnungen (11) und den Luftaustritts-Öffnungen (13) angeordneten, um eine Drehachse (22) drehantreibbar gelagerten Lüfterrad (21) zur Erzeugung eines Luftstromes (44) und einem in dem Gehäuse (4) angeordneten Heiz-Element (19) zur Erwärmung der Luft des Luftstromes (44), dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Lüfterrad (21) zwischen den Lufteintritts-Öffnungen (11) und dem Heiz-Element (19) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/38 (2006.01); F24H 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/384 (2013.01); F24H 3/0417 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239237 A2 20020911; EP 1239237 A3 20030827; DE 10110243 A1 20020912

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-06-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24H 3/04 A

2003-08-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 04D 29/38 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI