Global Patent Index - EP 1239255 A2

EP 1239255 A2 2002-09-11 - Heat exchanger with tubes and fins with sidewall profile and supporting profile

Title (en)

Heat exchanger with tubes and fins with sidewall profile and supporting profile

Title (de)

Lamellenrohrwärmetauscher mit Seitenwandprofil und Tragprofil

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à tubes et ailettes avec profilé de cloison latérale et profilé de supportage

Publication

EP 1239255 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004887 A

Priority

  • DE 10111489 A
  • DE 10111384 A

Abstract (en)

The heat exchanger has side wall strips (2) in the form of through elements (4), in one piece along their length, carrying the heat exchange block (3). The side wall strips also have cable channels (5), a bearer frame strip body (8) and air guide devices (9). Bearer strips (15) receive the heat exchange plates (16). which form the heat exchange block or blocks with the heat exchange tubes.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Lamellenrohrwärmetauscher, insbesondere zum Einsatz als Verflüssiger und Rückkühler, mit einem Gehäuse aus Seitenwandprofilen, Stirnwänden und Ventilatoren tragenden Elementen, die einen Wärmetauscherblock umschließen, wenigstens bestehend aus Wärmetauscherrohren und von diesen getragenen Lamellen bzw. Kühlrippen. Konstruktion und Aufbau des Lamellenrohrwärmetauschers sollen verbessert und insbesondere kostengünstiger gestaltet werden. Dies geschieht dadurch, dass die Seitenwandprofile (2) als den Wärmetauscherblock (3) tragende, in der Länge einteilige, durchgehende Elemente (4) ausgebildet sind und weitere Funktionselemente, insbesondere Kabelkanäle (5), Ventilatortragelemente (30), Revisionsöffnungen (7), Tragrahmenprofilkörper (8) und Luftleiteinrichtungen (9) aufweisen und dass zur Aufnahme der Wärmetauscherlamellen (16) bzw. Kühlrippen, die zusammen mit den Wärmetauscherrohren (19) den Wärmetauscherblock (3) oder mehrere derartige, hintereinandergeschaltete Blöcke bilden, Tragprofile (15) dienen, die die Lamellen (16) bzw. Kühlrippen stirnseitig umfassen und in den Seitenwandprofilen (2) gelagert sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/013; F28B 1/06; F28F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28B 1/06 (2006.01); F28F 1/32 (2006.01); F28F 9/00 (2006.01); F28F 9/013 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28B 1/06 (2013.01); F28F 1/32 (2013.01); F28F 9/001 (2013.01); F28F 9/013 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239255 A2 20020911; EP 1239255 A3 20050105

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-10-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-09-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-08-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2005-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI