Global Patent Index - EP 1239256 A1

EP 1239256 A1 2002-09-11 - Radiator with internal header tank oil cooler

Title (en)

Radiator with internal header tank oil cooler

Title (de)

Kühler mit integriertem Ölkühler

Title (fr)

Radiateur aver refroidisseur à huile intégré

Publication

EP 1239256 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02075700 A

Priority

US 80090101 A

Abstract (en)

A vehicle header tank (10) of the type in which most or all of the header tank (16) is metal and brazed concurrently with the rest of the core includes a simplified oil cooler structure integrated with the tank (16) and brazed concurrently with the rest of the core. A section (30) of tubing (28) similar to the radiator coolant flow tubes (12) passes into and out of the header tank (16) through a pair of slots (26) with a geometry similar to that in the regular slotted tank header plate (18) that accommodates the coolant flow tubes (12). Consequently, the oil cooler tube (28) can be installed in leak proof fashion inside the header tank (16) concurrently with the main core braze operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0234 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] EP 1030157 A1 20000823 - ZEXEL CORP [JP]
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 14 22 December 1999 (1999-12-22)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 05 14 September 2000 (2000-09-14)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 04 31 August 2000 (2000-08-31)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 02 29 February 2000 (2000-02-29)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 02 29 February 2000 (2000-02-29)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239256 A1 20020911; US 2002129928 A1 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI