Global Patent Index - EP 1239316 A2

EP 1239316 A2 2002-09-11 - Optical fiber storage reel

Title (en)

Optical fiber storage reel

Title (de)

Vorratsrolle für optische Faser

Title (fr)

Bobine de stockage pour fibre optique

Publication

EP 1239316 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02003776 A

Priority

US 79521201 A

Abstract (en)

An optical fiber storage reel includes an outer surface and an inner surface. A channel on the outer surface receives optical fiber and terminates in an exit port. The fiber is positioned within the channel and first routed to the exit port and then to the inner surface. The channel is S-shaped or teardrop-shaped so that the ends of the fiber transition from the exit port to the inner surface in the same direction. The storage reel may further include a wall between the outer surface and the inner surface that defines a hub. A splice holder may be provided on the outer surface. The storage reel may further include means for securing storage reels together in side-by-side relationship. The storage reel provides convenient, compact storage while maintaining the minimum bend radius of the optical fiber and access so that the stored fiber does not have to be manually routed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/4453 (2013.01); G02B 6/4457 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239316 A2 20020911; EP 1239316 A3 20040225; BR 0200627 A 20040309; CA 2368340 A1 20020828; US 2002118944 A1 20020829

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-12-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI