Global Patent Index - EP 1239413 A2

EP 1239413 A2 2002-09-11 - Authentication using a digital watermark

Title (en)

Authentication using a digital watermark

Title (de)

Authentifizierung mittels digitalem Wasserzeichen

Title (fr)

Authentification utilisant un filigrane digital

Publication

EP 1239413 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02251646 A

Priority

US 80144501 A

Abstract (en)

A method and apparatus for identifying an object include encoding physical attributes of an object where the encoded information is utilized as at least one element for composing a digital watermark for the object. In another embodiment the physical attributes of an object are utilized as a key for accessing information included in a digital watermark for the object. In a further embodiment, a digital watermark is incorporated into a bar code. As another aspect of this embodiment, information maybe encoded into the digital watermark of the barcode and may be decoded or otherwise retrieved by the use of a key. The digitally watermarked bar code may function in a conventional manner or may also include a "pass key" to allow reading of the bar code itself.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/04 (2006.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/12 (2006.01); G06K 19/14 (2006.01); G06T 1/00 (2006.01); G09C 5/00 (2006.01); H04N 1/387 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/12 (2013.01); G06K 19/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2001037455 A1 20011101; AU 2321202 A 20020912; BR 0202246 A 20021210; CA 2374772 A1 20020908; EP 1239413 A2 20020911; EP 1239413 A3 20040407; JP 2003037730 A 20030207; KR 20020072233 A 20020914; MX PA02002557 A 20041112

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041008

2005-02-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06T 1/00 A

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06K 19/10 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06K 19/14 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI