Global Patent Index - EP 1239423 A2

EP 1239423 A2 2002-09-11 - Bill validator

Title (en)

Bill validator

Title (de)

Geldscheinprüfgerät

Title (fr)

Validateur de billets de banque

Publication

EP 1239423 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02004330 A

Priority

JP 2001059618 A

Abstract (en)

A bill validator having a funnel-like shaped first light-guide disposed between a bill pathway and a plurality of light sources is disclosed. The validator can validate bills with a high accuracy, and a higher resolution ability by condensing light emitted from a plurality of light sources and narrowing a specific measuring point on the bill surface where transmittance and reflectance of the bill are measured. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/84 (2006.01); G01N 21/27 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239423 A2 20020911; EP 1239423 A3 20040609; EP 1239423 B1 20080409; CN 100397426 C 20080625; CN 1374625 A 20021016; DE 60225962 D1 20080521; DE 60225962 T2 20090520; ES 2302767 T3 20080801; JP 2002260051 A 20020913; JP 3518518 B2 20040412

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120302

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2013-02-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60225962

- Effective date: 20121002

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080409

2009-03-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090112

2008-11-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PANASONIC CORPORATION

2008-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2302767 T3

2008-05-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60225962 P 20080521

2008-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2008-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-06-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI