Global Patent Index - EP 1239430 A1

EP 1239430 A1 2002-09-11 - An electronic circuit

Title (en)

An electronic circuit

Title (de)

Eine elektronische Schaltung

Title (fr)

Un circuit électronique

Publication

EP 1239430 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 02251515 A

Priority

GB 0105655 A

Abstract (en)

An electronic circuit suitable for connection to a voltage source (6) such as a vehicle battery comprises an electrical load (1), such as a motor, a first connection provided between an input node of the load (1) and the voltage source (6), a second connection provided between an output node of the load and a ground rail, at least are smoothing capacitor (4) connected in parallel with the load (1) between the input node and the ground rail, a switching device (3) connected in series between the at least one smoothing capacitor (4) and the ground rail which is normally closed during operation of the load, and a control circuit (5) which is operative to open the switching device to isolate the at least one capacitor from the ground when the load is inoperative thereby reducing the quiescent current drawn by the circuit when the load is inoperative. To be accompanied, when published, by Figure 1 of the drawings. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 3/10; F02P 3/055; H02P 7/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3082 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2027 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2051 (2013.01); F02D 2400/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239430 A1 20020911; EP 1239430 B1 20070919; DE 60222488 D1 20071031; DE 60222488 T2 20080124; GB 0105655 D0 20010425

INPADOC legal status


2012-03-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60222488

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110305

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110305

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100303

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080620

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071230

2008-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60222488 P 20071031

2007-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-09-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050222

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI