Global Patent Index - EP 1239441 A1

EP 1239441 A1 2002-09-11 - Label for doorstep or similar

Title (en)

Label for doorstep or similar

Title (de)

Etiquette für Schwelle oder Ähnliches

Title (fr)

Etiquette pour barre de seuil ou analogue

Publication

EP 1239441 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02354038 A

Priority

FR 0102731 A

Abstract (en)

The covering strip carries a label with zones having different levels of transparency - a first transparent zone (2) simulating a visible portion (11) of the strip, and at least one second and partially-opaque zone (3) that simulates one of the adjacent layers of covering material, allowing a purchaser to visualise the appearance of the covering strip once it is in place on a floor or wall. The first zone is positioned obliquely across the label and the second zone is wider than the first, with its transparency reduced by frosting, varnish, ink or other means.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une étiquette (1) à placer à l'aplomb d'un élément de bordure (10) d'au moins une première surface, comportant plusieurs zones (2, 3) de niveaux de transparence différents pour simuler l'aspect de l'élément de bordure associé à ladite première surface. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239441 A1 20020911; EP 1239441 B1 20100602; DE 60236561 D1 20100715; FR 2821471 A1 20020830; FR 2821471 B1 20030627; PL 204402 B1 20100129; PL 352427 A1 20020909

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-01-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-07-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: 3M BRICOLAGE ET BATIMENT, FR

- Effective date: 20140617

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: 3M BRICOLAGE ET BATIMENT, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DINAC, SUSVILLE, FR

- Document: DE 60236561

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-07-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: 3M BRICOLAGE ET BATIMENT, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DINAC, SUSVILLE, LA MURE, FR

- Document: DE 60236561

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-07-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60236561

- Representative's name: REGIMBEAU, FR

- Effective date: 20130624

2014-07-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60236561

- Representative's name: REGIMBEAU, FR

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-07-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140605 AND 20140611

2014-05-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60236561

- Representative's name: REGIMBEAU, FR

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100913

2013-06-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60236561

- Representative's name: CABINET REGIMBEAU, FR

2013-06-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60236561

- Representative's name: REGIMBEAU, FR

2011-06-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60236561

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110303

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100602

2010-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60236561 P 20100715

2010-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2010-06-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI