Global Patent Index - EP 1239498 A1

EP 1239498 A1 2002-09-11 - Multipole contact block

Title (en)

Multipole contact block

Title (de)

Mehrpoliger Kontaktblock

Title (fr)

Bloc de contacts multipolaire

Publication

EP 1239498 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02075931 A

Priority

FR 0103278 A

Abstract (en)

The push button control block (10) has contact pieces (11 to 16) connection plane terminated and having fixed contacts with springs and a pusher. The connection planes have three distinct connection areas (P1 to P3) with the moving equipment (17) having three contact bridges (45 to 48) and two cross contact planes situated on the first front plane (PR) and cooperating with the second frontal plane (PF) contacts.

Abstract (fr)

Bloc de contacts multipolaire à rupture brusque utilisable dans un interrupteur de position ou un bouton-poussoir. Les pièces de contact ont des plages de connexion disposées selon trois plans de connexion P1-P3 et l'équipage mobile 17 a deux ponts de contact 45,46 situés dans un plan frontal PR pour coopérer avec les plans de connexion extrêmes P1,P3, ainsi qu'un ou deux autres ponts de contact 47,48 situés dans un autre plan frontal PF pour coopérer avec le plan de connexion médian P2, de manière à permettre un fonctionnement NO ou NC des contacts associés à ce troisième plan. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 11/00; H01H 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 1/20 (2006.01); H01H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/0012 (2013.01); H01H 1/20 (2013.01); H01H 9/0072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239498 A1 20020911; EP 1239498 B1 20100707; CN 1237558 C 20060118; CN 1374670 A 20021016; DE 60236904 D1 20100819; ES 2345322 T3 20100921; FR 2821980 A1 20020913; FR 2821980 B1 20030425; US 2002125121 A1 20020912; US 6657148 B2 20031202

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180704

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170222

2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170901

2017-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60236904

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160301

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-07-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60236904

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110408

2010-09-21 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2345322 T3

2010-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60236904 P 20100819

2010-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2009-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-02-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2003-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI