Global Patent Index - EP 1239499 A2

EP 1239499 A2 2002-09-11 - Electric push-button switch

Title (en)

Electric push-button switch

Title (de)

Elektrischer Drucktastenschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électrique à bouton poussoir

Publication

EP 1239499 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02002535 A

Priority

DE 10108530 A

Abstract (en)

The device has an actuating element (5) mounted in a housing (1) to act upon switch contacts connected to connection contacts (20) of a base (17). A membrane (11) spanning the entire cross-section of the housing is arranged in the housing between the actuating element and the switch contacts to seal the switch contacts against the actuating element.

Abstract (de)

Ein elektrischer Drucktastenschalter, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug, zur abgedichteten Montage in einen Einbauraum umfasst ein in einem Gehäuse (1) gelagertes Betätigungselement (5) zur Beaufschlagung von Schaltkontakten, die mit Anschlusskontakten (20) eines Sockels (17) in Verbindung stehen. In dem Gehäuse (1) ist zwischen dem Betätigungselement (5) und den Schaltkontakten eine den gesamten Gehäusequerschnitt überspannende Membrane (11) angeordnet, die die Schaltkontakte gegenüber dem Betätigungselement (5) abdichtet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239499 A2 20020911; EP 1239499 A3 20030212; EP 1239499 B1 20040506; DE 10108530 A1 20020912; DE 10108530 B4 20050127

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50200401 P 20040609

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2003-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI