Global Patent Index - EP 1239502 A2

EP 1239502 A2 2002-09-11 - Switch, especially electrical switch for power operated window or sliding roof for vehicles, switching device and method

Title (en)

Switch, especially electrical switch for power operated window or sliding roof for vehicles, switching device and method

Title (de)

Schalter, insbesondere elektrischer Fensterhebe- oder Schiebedachschalter für Fahrzeuge, Schaltsystem und Verfahren hierzu

Title (fr)

Commutateur, notamment commutateur électrique de lève-vitre ou de toit coulissant pour véhicules, dispositif de commutation et procédé

Publication

EP 1239502 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01129286 A

Priority

DE 10110648 A

Abstract (en)

The device has at least one actuating element with at least two actuating positions, a switching mechanism, contact points closable by the switching mechanism and electronics detecting the closure or the state of the contact points. The switch mechanism closes the switch contacts in a defined sequence depending on the actuation position of the actuating element and the electronics detects the sequence. Independent claims are also included for the following: a switch system and a method of operating a switch.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung geht aus von einem Schalter, insbesondere einem elektrischen Fensterhebe- oder Schiebedachschalter für Fahrzeuge, mit wenigstens einem in wenigstens zwei Betätigungsstellungen betätigbaren Betätigungselement, mit einer mit dem Betätigungselement in Wirkverbindung stehenden Schaltmechanik, mit über die Schaltmechanik schließbaren Kontaktstellen und mit einer die Schließung bzw. den Zustand der Kontaktstellen erfassenden Elektronik. Die Erfindung kennzeichnet sich dadurch, dass die Schaltmechanik die Kontaktstellen je nach Betätigungsstellung des Betätigungselements in einer bestimmten zeitlichen Abfolge schließt und die Elektronik die Abfolge erfasst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/00; H01H 21/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/24 (2006.01); H01H 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 21/24 (2013.01); H01H 23/003 (2013.01); H01H 2021/225 (2013.01); H01H 2300/006 (2013.01); H01H 2300/01 (2013.01); H01H 2300/054 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4326226 A1 19940210 - ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239502 A2 20020911; EP 1239502 A3 20040414; EP 1239502 B1 20110921; DE 10110648 A1 20020919

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180102

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171212

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-12-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120101

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111221

2012-10-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50115960

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111221

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50115960

- Effective date: 20111117

2011-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2011-09-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-09-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090730

2005-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040925

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI