Global Patent Index - EP 1239505 A2

EP 1239505 A2 2002-09-11 - Thermally actuated switch with printed adhesive layer

Title (en)

Thermally actuated switch with printed adhesive layer

Title (de)

Temperaturabhängiger Schalter mit aufgestempelter Kleberschicht

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à commande thermique avec couche adhésive imprimée

Publication

EP 1239505 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02000323 A

Priority

DE 10110562 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves inserting a switching mechanism (13) into the lower part (14) of a switch housing (12), closing the lower part of the housing with a cover part (17) while forming at least one joint point (31), stamping on an adhesive coating (32) near the joint point so as to seal it and allowing the adhesive coating to set. The switch is heated before applying the adhesive coating. Independent claims are also included for the following: a temperature-dependent switch with adhesive layer.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem temperaturabhängigen Schalter (10) ist in einem Gehäuse (12) ein temperaturabhängiges Schaltwerk (13) aufgenommen, das in Abhängigkeit von seiner Temperatur zwischen zumindest zwei außen an dem Gehäuse (12) vorgesehenen Anschlußelektroden (16, 18) eine elektrische Verbindung herstellt. Das Gehäuse hat ein Unterteil (14) sowie ein dieses unter Ausbildung zumindest einer Nahtstelle (31) verschließendes Deckelteil (17), wobei im Bereich der Nahtstelle (31) eine Kleberschicht (32) aufgestempelt ist, die die Nahtstelle (31) abdichtet (Fig. 1). Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines derart abgedichteten temperaturabhängigen Schalters (10) ist ebenfalls beschrieben (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 37/54; H01H 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 37/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2013.01); H01H 37/5427 (2013.01); Y10S 29/001 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49105 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49128 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239505 A2 20020911; EP 1239505 A3 20040428; DE 10110562 C1 20021219; US 2002145502 A1 20021010; US 2005285711 A1 20051229; US 6823580 B2 20041130

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120801

2009-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090805

2007-06-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOFSAESS, MARCEL P.

2007-06-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOFSAESS, MARCEL P.

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI