Global Patent Index - EP 1239543 A1

EP 1239543 A1 2002-09-11 - Flat antenna for the mobil satellite communication

Title (en)

Flat antenna for the mobil satellite communication

Title (de)

Flachantenne für die mobile Satellitenkommunikation

Title (fr)

Antenne plate pour communication mobile via satellites

Publication

EP 1239543 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02002836 A

Priority

  • DE 10108910 A
  • DE 10163793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2372625A1] An antenna far mobile satellite communication disposed on a substantially horizontally oriented conductive base surface having substantially linear conductor parts and an antenna connection point. The conductor parts have a substantially vertical extension portion, substantially horizontal extension portion which, together with the conductive base surface, form a high frequency conducting ring structure. The conductor parts are disposed in a plane, mounted perpendicular to the conductive base surface, and one of the vertical or horizontal extension portions is interrupted to form the antenna connection point. In a further interruption of one of the conductor parts, is provided at least one impedance connection point wired to an impedance. The positions of the impedance connection point and of the antenna connection point as well as the impedance are chosen so that, for the plane standing perpendicular to the conductive base surface, with waves polarized in this plane, the predetermined antenna gain values can be obtained for a predetermined elevation angle of the incident wave.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Antenne für die mobile Satellitenkommunikation auf einer im wesentlichen horizontal orientierten leitenden Grundfläche (1), bestehend aus im wesentlichen linearen Leiterteilen (4) und einer Antennenanschlußstelle (5). Sie besteht aus Leiterteilen mit wesentlicher vertikaler Ausdehnung (4a) und Leiterteilen mit wesentlicher horizontaler Ausdehnung (4b), die zusammen mit der leitenden Grundfläche (1) eine hochfrequent leitende Ringstruktur (2) bilden. Die Leiterteile sind im wesentlichen in einer senkrecht zur leitenden Grundfläche (1) stehenden Ebene (0) geführt, wobei einer der Leiterteile mit wesentlicher vertikaler Ausdehnung (4a) oder einer der Leiterteile mit wesentlicher horizontaler Ausdehnung (4b) zur Ausbildung der Antennenanschlußstelle (5) unterbrochen ist und durch Unterbrechung einer der Leiterteile mindestens eine mit einer Impedanz (7) beschaltete Impedanzanschlußstelle (6) vorhanden ist und die Positionen der Impedanzanschlußstelle (6) und der Antennenanschlußstelle (5) sowie die Impedanz (7) derart gewählt sind, daß für die in der senkrecht zur leitenden Grundfläche (1) stehenden Ebene (0) mit in dieser Ebene polarisierten Wellen für vorgegebene Elevationswinkel (81) des Welleneinfalls (80) die vorgegebenen Antennengewinnwerte eingestellt sind (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/42; H01Q 9/26; H01Q 9/36; H01Q 21/24; H01Q 21/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/44 (2006.01); H01Q 7/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/26 (2006.01); H01Q 9/36 (2006.01); H01Q 9/42 (2006.01); H01Q 21/24 (2006.01); H01Q 21/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 7/00 (2013.01); H01Q 9/26 (2013.01); H01Q 9/36 (2013.01); H01Q 9/42 (2013.01); H01Q 21/24 (2013.01); H01Q 21/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239543 A1 20020911; EP 1239543 B1 20060809; AT 336090 T 20060915; BR 0200518 A 20021001; BR PI0200518 B1 20160524; CA 2372625 A1 20020823; CA 2372625 C 20031118; DE 10163793 A1 20020905; DE 50207754 D1 20060921; KR 100658016 B1 20061215; KR 20020069178 A 20020829; MX PA02001913 A 20040421; US 2002118138 A1 20020829; US 6653982 B2 20031125

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-01-31 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50207754

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2017-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070208

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070208

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061110

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FUBA AUTOMOTIVE G.M.B.H. & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-03-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060809

2007-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-01-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070109

2006-11-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061120

2006-11-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-11-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50207754 P 20060921

2006-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-08-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-08-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-08-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-08-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060809

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020930

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI