Global Patent Index - EP 1239550 A1

EP 1239550 A1 2002-09-11 - Plug connector

Title (en)

Plug connector

Title (de)

Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur à fiche

Publication

EP 1239550 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 02002746 A

Priority

DE 10109719 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002119699A1] For a plug connector having a plug-in side and a conductor-connecting side for a coaxial cable, it is proposed that an insulating body with an electrical contact element is disposed in a sleeve-shaped plug-in part, the said insulating body having tongues which are spread apart and are separated by slots and which extend from an annular groove to the end of the insulating body, gradations which are forced into the insulation of the electrical middle conductor being provided on the inside of the tongues, and the electrical contact element being held in a centered manner in a receiving bore in the insulating body.

Abstract (de)

Für einen Steckverbinder mit einer Steckseite und einer Leiteranschlußseite für ein Koaxialkabel, wird vorgeschlagen, dass ein Isolierkörper mit einem elektrischen Kontaktelement in einem hülsenförmigen Steckteil angeordnet ist, wobei der Isolierkörper sich abspreizende durch Schlitze getrennte Zungen aufweist, die sich von einer Ringnut zum Ende des Isolierkörpers erstrecken, wobei auf der Innenseite der Zungen Abstufungen vorgesehen sind, die sich in die Isolierung des elektrischen Mittelleiters einpressen und wobei das elektrische Kontaktelement zentriert in einer Aufnahmebohrung im Isolierkörper gehalten ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/02 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01); H01R 103/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5829 (2013.01); H01R 9/0518 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239550 A1 20020911; EP 1239550 B1 20080416; DE 10109719 C1 20021024; DE 50212091 D1 20080529; JP 2002260792 A 20020913; JP 3711357 B2 20051102; US 2002119699 A1 20020829; US 6517379 B2 20030211

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110901

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110207

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2012-01-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50212091

- Effective date: 20110901

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110207

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100225

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212091 P 20080529

2008-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-08-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO. KG

2005-08-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZHUHAI HARTING LTD. CHINA

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI