Global Patent Index - EP 1239553 A2

EP 1239553 A2 2002-09-11 - Electrical connectors

Title (en)

Electrical connectors

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteurs électriques

Publication

EP 1239553 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 02251534 A

Priority

GB 0105408 A

Abstract (en)

A cordless electrical connector part comprises at least one annular slot 6 for receiving an annular contact member 28 and an electrical contact 18 disposed in said slot for making electrical connection with the annular contact member 28. A portion of said annular slot 6 in the vicinity of said contact 18 is provided with restrictions 10 so as to make that portion of the slot 6 locally narrower than the rest of the slot 6. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/38 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/38 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239553 A2 20020911; EP 1239553 A3 20041222; EP 1239553 B1 20080521; DE 60226657 D1 20080703; EP 1887665 A1 20080213; GB 0105408 D0 20010418; GB 0417287 D0 20040908; GB 2373105 A 20020911; GB 2373105 B 20040922; GB 2399698 A 20040922; GB 2399698 B 20051019

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100305

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090305

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100305

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-04-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090224

2008-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60226657 P 20080703

2008-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2008-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-12-07 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: ATBECHCYDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLUMCNLPTSETR

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-04-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI