Global Patent Index - EP 1239553 A3

EP 1239553 A3 2004-12-22 - Electrical connectors

Title (en)

Electrical connectors

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteurs électriques

Publication

EP 1239553 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 02251534 A

Priority

GB 0105408 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1239553A2] A cordless electrical connector part comprises at least one annular slot 6 for receiving an annular contact member 28 and an electrical contact 18 disposed in said slot for making electrical connection with the annular contact member 28. A portion of said annular slot 6 in the vicinity of said contact 18 is provided with restrictions 10 so as to make that portion of the slot 6 locally narrower than the rest of the slot 6. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/38 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/38 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239553 A2 20020911; EP 1239553 A3 20041222; EP 1239553 B1 20080521; DE 60226657 D1 20080703; EP 1887665 A1 20080213; GB 0105408 D0 20010418; GB 0417287 D0 20040908; GB 2373105 A 20020911; GB 2373105 B 20040922; GB 2399698 A 20040922; GB 2399698 B 20051019

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100305

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090305

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100305

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-04-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090224

2008-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60226657 P 20080703

2008-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2008-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-12-07 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: ATBECHCYDEDKESFIFRGBGRIEITLUMCNLPTSETR

- Effective date: 20050822

2005-09-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-04-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050216

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI