Global Patent Index - EP 1239554 A1

EP 1239554 A1 2002-09-11 - Electrical connection device

Title (en)

Electrical connection device

Title (de)

Elektrische Verbindungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion électrique

Publication

EP 1239554 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 02290244 A

Priority

FR 0103152 A

Abstract (en)

The fixed to removable element connector has a circular conductor track (62,64,66) on the front face. The rear face connection of the electronic apparatus to the conductor tracks is by electrical conductor elements placed in reamed out elements (72,74,76) in the fixed element block.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne notamment un élément fixe d'un dispositif de connexion électrique d'un appareil électronique pour connecter au moins un conducteur électrique de l'appareil électronique à un élément mobile de connexion électrique disposé à l'extérieur de l'appareil électronique, caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend, du côté extérieur à l'appareil électronique, au moins une piste circulaire conductrice (62, 64, 66) disposée sur une face avant, ladite piste circulaire conductrice étant connectée, du côté intérieur de l'appareil électronique, à une face arrière audit conducteur électrique de l'appareil électronique par l'intermédiaire d'un conducteur électrique disposé dans un alésage (72, 74, 76) traversant l'élément fixe. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/02; H01R 35/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/38 (2011.01); H01R 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/38 (2013.01); H01R 35/04 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239554 A1 20020911; EP 1239554 B1 20120111; AT 541341 T 20120115; CN 1258249 C 20060531; CN 1374723 A 20021016; FR 2821991 A1 20020913; FR 2821991 B1 20030523; JP 2002270323 A 20020920; US 2002127891 A1 20020912; US 6634888 B2 20031021

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120204

2014-04-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120422

2013-02-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60241943

- Effective date: 20121012

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120411

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120312

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121012

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: Z124, KY

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: IMERJ LIMITED, GRAND CAYMAN, KY

- Document: DE 60241943

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: Z124, KY

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALCATEL, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60241943

- Effective date: 20120117

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60241943

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BRESSEL UND PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60241943

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BRESSEL UND PARTNER MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-09-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-09-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-09-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 541341 T

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: IMERJ, LIMITED

- Effective date: 20120228

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120511

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120412

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-08-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-07-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: Z124

2012-05-02 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-03-08 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60241943

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-02-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2012-01-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 541341 T

- Effective date: 20120115

2012-01-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2012-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2011-11-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMERJ, LIMITED

2011-11-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMERJ, LIMITED

2011-09-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 24/38 20110101AFI20110803BHEP

2011-09-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01R 35/04 20060101ALI20110803BHEP

2011-08-03 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 60241943

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H01R0024020000

- IPC: H01R0024380000

2009-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090814

2009-07-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IPG ELECTRONICS 504 LIMITED

2005-08-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TCL & ALCATEL MOBILE PHONES LIMITED

2005-08-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TAM HOLDINGS LIMITED

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI