Global Patent Index - EP 1239617 A2

EP 1239617 A2 2002-09-11 - System and method for processing traffic information

Title (en)

System and method for processing traffic information

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Verkehrsinformationen

Title (fr)

Système et méthode pour le traitement d'informations routières

Publication

EP 1239617 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003954 A

Priority

DE 10111131 A

Abstract (en)

The system has a processing device (2) coupled on the input side to a number of traffic information sources (10-13) and designed to evaluate voice and/or digitally encoded traffic information from the various sources, to process it and to pass it to at least one output unit (14-16) and/or to place it in a memory device (3) coupled to the processing device. An Independent claim is also included for a method of operating a system for processing traffic information.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein System und ein Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Verkehrsinformationen. Die Erfindung ist dazu ausgelegt, Verkehrsinformationen beliebiger Verkehrsinformationsdienste, d. h. sowohl Sprache als auch digital codierte Daten, auszuwerten, bei Bedarf zu komprimieren und in einem Speicher abzulegen oder zur weiteren Verwendung weiterzuleiten. Auf diese Weise wird mithin ein intelligentes System bereitgestellt, das eine Kombination von sonst unabhängig genutzten Verkehrsinformationsdiensten zulässt. Durch die Kombination dieser unterschiedlichen Verkehrsinformationsdienste lässt sich die Leistungsfähigkeit des gesamten Systems und die Informationssicherheit für den Anwender signifikant steigern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/55 (2013.01); G08G 1/093 (2013.01); G08G 1/094 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239617 A2 20020911; EP 1239617 A3 20061227; DE 10111131 A1 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080905

2007-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070625

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI