Global Patent Index - EP 1239700 A2

EP 1239700 A2 2002-09-11 - Method of operating a hearing device or hearing system and a corresponding device and system

Title (en)

Method of operating a hearing device or hearing system and a corresponding device and system

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Hörhilfegerätes oder Hörgerätesystem sowie Hörhilfegerät oder Hörgerätesystem

Title (fr)

Prothèse auditive ou un système de prothèses audives et ainsi que leur méthode d'utilitsation

Publication

EP 1239700 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02003475 A

Priority

DE 10110258 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002176594A1] For reducing feedback-conditioned oscillations in a hearing aid device, microphone signals of a first microphone and of a distanced, second microphone are compared to one another. When oscillations are detected at the same frequency in both microphone signals, these oscillations are determined to be useful (non-feedback) tonal signals. Oscillations that are only present in one of the microphone signals, in contrast, are feedback-conditioned and are suppressed using suitable measures.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Hörhilfegerät (2; 11, 11') werden zur Reduzierung rückkopplungsbedingter Oszillationen Mikrofonsignale eines ersten Mikrofons (1; 12) und eines beabstandeten zweiten Mikrofons (4; 12') miteinander verglichen. Werden in beiden Mikrofonsignalen Oszillationen bei derselben Frequenz detektiert, so handelt es sich dabei um tonale Nutzsignale. Oszillationen, die nur in einem der Mikrofonsignale vorhanden sind, sind dagegen rückkopplungsbedingt und werden durch geeignete Maßnahmen unterdrückt. Das Hörgerätesystem kann aus zwei Hörhilfegeräten bestehen, wobei das erste Mikrofon im ersten Hörgerät und des zweite Mikrofon im zweiten Hörgerät angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00; H04R 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/552 (2013.01); H04R 25/407 (2013.01); H04R 25/453 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239700 A2 20020911; EP 1239700 A3 20060802; EP 1239700 B1 20080507; EP 1239700 B2 20170726; AT 394896 T 20080515; DE 10110258 C1 20020829; DE 50212199 D1 20080619; DK 1239700 T3 20080901; DK 1239700 T4 20171106; US 2002176594 A1 20021128; US 7013015 B2 20060314

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-11-06 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20171101

2017-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM AND CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE , CH

2017-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SIVANTOS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK GMBH, DE

2017-07-31 [REG CH AELC] CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM

2017-07-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20170726

2017-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2017-07-26 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 50212199

2017-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-11-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIVANTOS GMBH

2015-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SIVANTOS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK GMBH, 91058 ERLANGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50212199

2015-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50212199

- Representative's name: FDST PATENTANWAELTE FREIER DOERR STAMMLER TSCH, DE

2015-05-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GN RESOUND A/S/ WIDEX A/S/ PHONAK AG/ OTICON A/S

- Effective date: 20090206

2015-04-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50212199

- Representative's name: FDST PATENTANWAELTE FREIER DOERR STAMMLER TSCH, DE

2014-08-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GN RESOUND A/S/ WIDEX A/S/ PHONAK AG/ OTICON A/S

- Effective date: 20090206

2013-01-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GN RESOUND A/S/ WIDEX A/S/ PHONAK AG/ OTICON A/S

- Effective date: 20090206

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090214

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100214

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080808

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090214

2010-06-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GN RESOUND A/S/ WIDEX A/S/ PHONAK AG/ OTICON A/S

- Effective date: 20090206

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-03-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GN RESOUND A/S/ WIDEX A/S/ PHONAK AG/ OTICON A/S

- Effective date: 20090206

2009-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081007

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080807

2008-12-10 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2008-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080818

2008-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080507

2008-09-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2008-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50212199 P 20080619

2008-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2008-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070919

2007-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI