Global Patent Index - EP 1239702 A2

EP 1239702 A2 2002-09-11 - Electrical heating coil which heats a flowing gaseous medium and its electrical resistive heating element

Title (en)

Electrical heating coil which heats a flowing gaseous medium and its electrical resistive heating element

Title (de)

Heizleiterwendel zum Erwärmen eines strömenden gasförmigen Mediums sowie elektrisches Widerstandsheizelement

Title (fr)

Conducteur chauffant sous forme d'hélices destiné à chauffer un milieu de forme gazeuse en mouvement ainsi que son élément chauffant résistif

Publication

EP 1239702 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 02004629 A

Priority

DE 10111000 A

Abstract (en)

The heater is deflected in the peripheral surface of the coil (1) from the inclined gradient line alternately in opposite directions. The deflections may be zigzag-shaped or wave-shape. The heater consists of a wire (2) with a circular cross-section, preferably a thermistor passive thermal control (PCT) wire.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem elektrischen Widerstandsheizelement zum Erwärmen eines strömenden gasförmigen Mediums, vornehmlich Luft, ist der die Wendel (1) bildende Heizleiter (2), der vorzugsweise aus einem Draht mit Kreisquerschnitt besteht, in der durch die Steigungslinie der Wendel (1) gebildeten Umfangsfläche der Wendel aus der Steigungslinie heraus abwechselnd nach entgegengesetzten Richtungen ausgelenkt. Die Auslenkungen können zickzackförmig oder wellenförmig verlaufen. Durch die Kombination einer Heizleiterwendel mit im Verhältnis zu deren Abmessungen kurzwelligen Wellungen in der Umfangsfläche wird der Durchströmquerschnitt von dem die Wärme erzeugenden Heizleiter (2) engmaschig durchsetzt. Dadurch ergibt sich eine vielfältige Verwirbelung der ein mit einer solchen Wendel ausgestattetes Heizelement durchströmenden Luft mit der Folge eines besonders günstigen Übergangs der Wärme vom Heizleiter auf die Luft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/16; F24H 3/04; H05B 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/16 (2013.01); H05B 2203/022 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1239702 A2 20020911; EP 1239702 A3 20050406; CA 2374998 A1 20020907; CA 2374998 C 20041026; DE 10111000 A1 20020919; US 2002125243 A1 20020912; US 6737615 B2 20040518

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110810

2009-07-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICROHELLIX GMBH

2005-12-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-10-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05B 3/16 A

2005-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 05B 3/50 B

2005-04-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24H 3/04 B

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI