Global Patent Index - EP 1239730 A2

EP 1239730 A2 2002-09-18 - PEROXY ACIDS WITH EXCELLENT ADHESION TO SURFACES

Title (en)

PEROXY ACIDS WITH EXCELLENT ADHESION TO SURFACES

Title (de)

PERSÄUREN MIT GUTER HAFTUNG AUF OBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

PERACIDES AYANT UNE BONNE ADHESION SUR DES SURFACES

Publication

EP 1239730 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00990742 A

Priority

  • DE 19962342 A
  • EP 0012689 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0147359A2] The invention relates to the use of ester peroxy acids for improving surface perfusion during the disinfection of surfaces and to synergistic antimicrobial combinations of ester peroxy acids and additional constituents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 37/16; A01N 25/30; C11D 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 37/16 (2006.01); A61L 2/18 (2006.01); A61L 2/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/75 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 2/186 (2013.01); A01N 37/16 (2013.01); A61L 2/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/75 (2013.01); C11D 3/2079 (2013.01); C11D 3/3418 (2013.01); C11D 3/3945 (2013.01); C11D 3/48 (2013.01); A61L 2202/17 (2013.01); A61L 2202/18 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 37/16 + A01N 59/00 + A01N 37/16 + A01N 37/04 + A01N 37/02 + A01N 25/30 + A01N 25/24
  2. A01N 37/16 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0147359A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0147359 A2 20010705; WO 0147359 A3 20020516; DE 19962342 A1 20010712; EP 1239730 A2 20020918; US 2003133956 A1 20030717; US 2003220216 A1 20031127; US 6683040 B2 20040127; US 7049277 B2 20060523

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLAB INC.

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR