Global Patent Index - EP 1239741 A1

EP 1239741 A1 2002-09-18 - GEL PRODUCTS FORTIFIED WITH CALCIUM AND METHOD OF PREPARATION

Title (en)

GEL PRODUCTS FORTIFIED WITH CALCIUM AND METHOD OF PREPARATION

Title (de)

MIT KALZIUM ANGEREICHERTE GELPRODUKTE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PRODUITS A BASE DE GEL ENRICHIS EN CALCIUM ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION

Publication

EP 1239741 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99966498 A

Priority

US 9930438 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0143564A1] Disclosed are improved, intermediate moisture sweetened gelled food compositions fortified with calcium supplied by calcium phosphate. The gelled compositions comprise: A) about 55 to 85 % by weight nutritive carbohydrate sweeteners; B) sufficient amounts of a gelling agent(s) to provide a gel strength of about 2-8 kg/cm<2>; C) about 50 to 1500 mg/oz total calcium; and D) about 9 to 20 % moisture. Also disclosed are methods for the preparation of such fruit products involving forming a concentrated slurry of calcium phosphate having a particle size such that at least 90 % are less than 150 mu m, forming a gellable blend and admixing the gellable composition with the slurry to form a gellable calcium fortified composition and forming into desired shaped and sized pieces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23L 1/06; A23L 1/0562

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 21/10 (2016.01); A23L 29/231 (2016.01); A23L 29/269 (2016.01); A23L 29/281 (2016.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23L 21/10 (2016.08); A23L 29/231 (2016.08); A23L 29/272 (2016.08); A23L 29/284 (2016.08)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0143564A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0143564 A1 20010621; AU 2201600 A 20010625; CN 1288998 C 20061213; CN 1398163 A 20030219; EP 1239741 A1 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1047872

2007-10-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070306

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041001

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE