Global Patent Index - EP 1239752 A1

EP 1239752 A1 2002-09-18 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BRUSHES AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING BRUSHES AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BÜRSTEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE BROSSES ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1239752 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99964664 A

Priority

EP 9910328 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0145534A1] The invention relates to a method for producing brushes, in particular tooth brushes by injection molding, wherein a brush body is shaped in a mould cavity, brush filaments (9) for forming a brush head are connected to the brush body and at least one soft elastic cleaning element (12) extending substantially parallel to the brush filaments is formed, preferably by performing injection on said brush body. The invention aims at improving the aforementioned method in such a way that contouring and/or finishing of the brush filaments is performed without any impairment by the soft elastic cleaning element. According to the invention, this is achieved by finishing the useful side of the brushes, whereby the at least one soft elastic cleaning element is removed from the working area of the finishing tools during said finishing. The invention also relates to a device for implementing the method, which is characterized in that it comprises a clamp device (3) for clamping the brush body and at least one means which acts upon the soft elastic element, said means being movable in relation to the clamp device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46D 9/02; A46D 1/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46D 9/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0145534A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0145534 A1 20010628; DE 59910085 D1 20040902; EP 1239752 A1 20020918; EP 1239752 B1 20040728; US 2003001427 A1 20030102; US 6808236 B2 20041026

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59910085

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101222

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100106

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091231

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091217

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-06-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910085 P 20040902

2004-08-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE