Global Patent Index - EP 1239753 A1

EP 1239753 A1 2002-09-18 - ADJUSTABLE PADDING DEVICE FOR A PIECE OF FURNITURE USED FOR SITTING AND/OR LYING UPON

Title (en)

ADJUSTABLE PADDING DEVICE FOR A PIECE OF FURNITURE USED FOR SITTING AND/OR LYING UPON

Title (de)

VERSTELLBARE POLSTERUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN SITZ- UND/ODER LIEGEMÖBEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REMBOURRAGE POUR MEUBLE DE TYPE SIEGE ET/OU LIT

Publication

EP 1239753 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00990808 A

Priority

  • DE 19962537 A
  • EP 0013082 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0147395A1] The invention relates to an adjustable padding device for a piece of furniture used for sitting and/or lying upon. The inventive device comprises at least one flat elastically deformable padding element and at least one adjustable supporting device (4) with a base body for supporting the padding element in a flat manner. Adjusting means are provided on the supporting device which are used to adjust the inclination and/or height of at least one part of the supporting device, whereby the padding element is attached to the supporting device (4) and to the adjusting means to form a unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/04; A47C 23/06; A47C 27/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/08 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01); A47C 23/06 (2006.01); A47C 27/20 (2006.01); A61G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/041 (2013.01); A47C 20/08 (2013.01); A47C 23/06 (2013.01); A47C 27/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0147395A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0147395 A1 20010705; AT 281101 T 20041115; AU 3015301 A 20010709; CN 1221203 C 20051005; CN 1413092 A 20030423; DE 19962537 A1 20010726; DE 20023412 U1 20041118; EP 1239753 A1 20020918; EP 1239753 B1 20041103; ES 2232523 T3 20050601; JP 2003518400 A 20030610; JP 3810687 B2 20060816; PT 1239753 E 20050331; US 2002152552 A1 20021024; US 6742205 B2 20040601

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171231

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180109

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008546

- Representative's name: WAGNER, CARSTEN, DIPL.-ING. (UNIV.), DE

2015-12-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111231

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20101228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CIMOSYS A.G.

- Effective date: 20041231

2007-05-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DEON AG

- Effective date: 20061208

2006-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DEON AG

- Free text: CIMOSYS AG#SCHLOSSBUEEL#8638 GOLDINGEN (CH) -TRANSFER TO- DEON AG#FREIGUTSTRASSE 5#8002 ZUERICH (CH)

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CIMOSYS A.G.

- Effective date: 20041231

2005-06-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232523 T3

2005-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050125

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2005-03-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-02-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050203

2005-01-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050103

2004-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-12-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008546 P 20041209

2004-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-11-03 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI