Global Patent Index - EP 1239756 A2

EP 1239756 A2 2002-09-18 - PNEUMATIC MATTRESS

Title (en)

PNEUMATIC MATTRESS

Title (de)

PNEUMATISCHE LIEGE

Title (fr)

MATELAS PNEUMATIQUE

Publication

EP 1239756 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01916834 A

Priority

  • CH 0100223 W
  • CH 23182000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0150918A2] The inventive pneumatic mattress (1) is comprised of an air-tight cover (2) which is arranged in a top layer (7) and in a bottom layer (6), whereby the top layer (7) and bottom layer (6) are interconnected by a multitude of cross-members (3), for example, textile cross-members. A rear wall (4) is arranged outside of the air-tight area of the cover (2), however, it is enclosed by the top and bottom layers (7, 6). The rear wall (4) is fastened to the wall (5) using known means (5) such that the cover (2) does not require passages running therethrough. The cover (2) is comprised of a textile material which does not stretch easily and which is coated in order to render it air-tight. The cross-members (3) are also made of, for example, a textile material that does not stretch easily. For use, the pneumatic mattress (1) is inflated with compressed air for which a valve (9) is provided. The pneumatic mattress (1) can comprise an elevated edge (8) located on the edge opposite the wall (5). When not in use, the pneumatic mattress (1) can be deflated and stored, for example, in a bag (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 9/06 (2006.01); A47C 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/081 (2013.01); A47C 17/38 (2013.01); A47C 27/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0150918A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0150918 A2 20010719; WO 0150918 A3 20020725; AT 306838 T 20051115; CA 2366098 A1 20010719; CA 2366098 C 20090811; CN 1142738 C 20040324; CN 1398167 A 20030219; DE 50107744 D1 20051124; EP 1239756 A2 20020918; EP 1239756 B1 20051019; HK 1053415 A1 20041203; JP 2003519518 A 20030624; JP 5193411 B2 20130508; US 2003070237 A1 20030417; US 6643868 B2 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50107744

2013-12-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: ZIMMERGASSE 16, 8008 ZUERICH (CH)

2010-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: STUMP UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060409

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PROSPECTIVE CONCEPTS A.G.

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-05-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-17 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-03-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-02-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060107

2006-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-01-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2006-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060119

2005-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. R.C. SALGO + PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2005-11-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107744 P 20051124

2005-11-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-10-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-10-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-10-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROSPECTIVE CONCEPTS AG

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010912

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR