Global Patent Index - EP 1239762 A2

EP 1239762 A2 2002-09-18 - DRIVABLE WAGON, IN PARTICULAR A PROCESSING OR FLOOR CLEANING MACHINE

Title (en)

DRIVABLE WAGON, IN PARTICULAR A PROCESSING OR FLOOR CLEANING MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHRBARER WAGEN, INSBESONDERE ARBEITS- ODER BODENREINIGUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

ENGIN MOBILE, NOTAMMENT MACHINE DE TRAVAIL OU DE NETTOYAGE DU SOL

Publication

EP 1239762 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00990672 A

Priority

  • DE 19959440 A
  • EP 0012353 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0141621A2] The invention relates to an improved drivable wagon, in particular embodied as a processing or a cleaning device which is suitable in particular for independent driving by the provision of at least one sensor device (13, 17). Said device can be at least be swung in unison with at least one steerable running wheel (7) and/or a swingable floor processing or cleaning unit or head (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 11/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/16 (2006.01); A47L 11/18 (2006.01); A47L 11/283 (2006.01); A47L 11/30 (2006.01); A47L 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 11/4061 (2013.01); A47L 11/305 (2013.01); A47L 2201/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0141621A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0141621 A2 20010614; WO 0141621 A3 20020228; AT 310439 T 20051215; DE 19959440 A1 20010628; DE 19959440 C2 20011213; DE 50011715 D1 20051229; EP 1239762 A2 20020918; EP 1239762 B1 20051123; JP 2003515414 A 20030507; US 2002183908 A1 20021205; US 6904989 B2 20050614

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-08-14 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-01-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011715 P 20051229

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI NL

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE GB LI NL

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE GB LI NL

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR